+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (11)
On September 26, 2022 in the House:
- Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT
On September 21, 2022 in the Senate:
- Remarks see Senate Journal Page 920
- Third consideration and final passage (47-2)
On September 20, 2022 in the Senate:
- Amended on third consideration (49-1)
On June 29, 2022 in the Senate:
- Re-reported as committed
On June 22, 2022 in the Senate:
- Remarks see Senate Journal Page 653
- Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration, with amendments
On June 14, 2022 in the Senate:
- First consideration
- Reported as amended
On April 22, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT
+ − Analysis
+ − Votes (2)
September 21, 2022: Senate Floor Vote: SB 1203 PN 1931, Final Passage
September 20, 2022: Senate Floor Vote: SB 1203 PN 1810, 2021 A5215, ARGALL Amendment No. A-5215
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor