+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (27)
On November 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Act No. 124
- Approved by the Governor
On October 27, 2016 in the Senate:
- Presented to the Governor
- Signed in House
On October 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed in Senate
- Senate concurred in House amendments (47-0)
- Re-reported on concurrence, as committed
- Referred to RULES AND EXECUTIVE NOMINATIONS
- In the Senate
- Third consideration and final passage (190-0)
- Re-reported as committed
On October 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Second consideration, with amendments
- Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
- Remarks see House Journal Page ....
On October 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- Removed from table
On October 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- Laid on the table
- First consideration
- Reported as amended
On June 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE
On June 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- In the House
- Third consideration and final passage (49-0)
On June 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- Second consideration
On June 13, 2016 in the Senate:
- Re-reported as amended
On June 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
On June 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On May 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to CONSUMER PROTECTION AND PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE
+ − Votes (5)
October 26, 2016: House Floor Vote: SB 1202 PN 2199, FP
October 26, 2016: Senate Floor Vote: SB 1202 PN 2199, CONCUR IN HOUSE AMENDMENTS
October 25, 2016: House Floor Vote: SB 1202 PN 2177, 2015 A10732, DIGIROLAMO
October 25, 2016: House Floor Vote: SB 1202 PN 2177, 2015 A10707, GIBBONS
June 15, 2016: Senate Floor Vote: SB 1202 PN 1912, FINAL PASSAGE
+ − Sponsors (21)
Type:
Primary Sponsor