+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (10)
On October 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to EDUCATION
On September 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- In the House
- Third consideration and final passage (48-0)
On September 25, 2018 in the Senate:
- Amended on third consideration
On September 24, 2018 in the Senate:
- Re-reported as committed
On June 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration
On June 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- First consideration
- Reported as amended
On May 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to EDUCATION