+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (27)
On October 24, 2018 in the Senate:
- Act No. 162
- Approved by the Governor
On October 18, 2018 in the Senate:
- Presented to the Governor
On October 17, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed in House
- Signed in Senate
- Remarks see Senate Journal Page ....
- Senate concurred in House amendments (49-0)
- In the Senate
- Third consideration and final passage (183-2)
- Re-reported as committed
On October 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- Remarks see House Journal Page ....
- Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration, with amendments
On October 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- Removed from table
On October 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Laid on the table
- First consideration
- Reported as amended
On June 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to AGRICULTURE AND RURAL AFFAIRS
On June 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- In the House
- Third consideration and final passage (49-0)
On June 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- Amended on third consideration
On June 11, 2018 in the Senate:
- Re-reported as committed
On May 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration
On May 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- First consideration
- Reported as amended
On May 18, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to AGRICULTURE AND RURAL AFFAIRS