+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (26)
On July 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Act No. 59
- Approved by the Governor
On June 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Presented to the Governor
On June 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed in House
- Signed in Senate
- Senate concurred in House amendments (50-0)
On June 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Re-reported on concurrence, as committed
On June 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to RULES AND EXECUTIVE NOMINATIONS
- In the Senate
- Third consideration and final passage (199-0)
On June 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Re-reported as committed
On June 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second consideration, with amendments
- Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
- Remarks see House Journal Page 1204-1207
On June 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Removed from table
On June 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- Laid on the table
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On March 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to TRANSPORTATION
On March 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- In the House
- Remarks see Senate Journal Page 200
- Third consideration and final passage (45-0)
On March 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second consideration
On February 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On January 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to TRANSPORTATION
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (4)
June 24, 2019: House Floor Vote: SB 117 PN 1034, FP
June 19, 2019: House Floor Vote: SB 117 PN 85, 2019 A2033, PICKETT
March 19, 2019: Senate Floor Vote: SB 117 PN 85, FINAL PASSAGE
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor