+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (25)
On October 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Act No. 188
- Approved by the Governor
On October 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Presented to the Governor
- Signed in House
On October 16, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed in Senate
- Senate concurred in House amendments
- Re-reported on concurrence, as committed
On October 15, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to RULES AND EXECUTIVE NOMINATIONS
- In the Senate
- Third consideration and final passage
- Re-reported as committed
On October 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Removed from table
- Second consideration
- Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
On September 15, 2014 in the Senate:
- Laid on the table
- First consideration
- Reported as amended
On July 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to URBAN AFFAIRS
- In the House
- Remarks see Senate Journal Page 2098
- Third consideration and final passage
On June 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- Second consideration
On June 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On January 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to URBAN AFFAIRS AND HOUSING
+ − Votes (4)
October 16, 2014: Senate Floor Vote: SB 1135 PN 2269, CONCUR IN HOUSE AMENDMENTS
October 15, 2014: House Floor Vote: SB 1135 PN 2269, FP
October 14, 2014: House Floor Vote: SB 1135 PN 2269, SUSP RULES, TURZAI
July 1, 2014: Senate Floor Vote: SB 1135 PN 1686, FINAL PASSAGE
+ − Sponsors (23)
Type:
Primary Sponsor