+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (27)
On December 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Act No. 123
- Approved by the Governor
On December 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Presented to the Governor
- Signed in House
On December 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed in Senate
- Remarks see Senate Journal Page 1310
- Senate concurred in House amendments
On December 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- Re-reported on concurrence, as committed
- Referred to RULES AND EXECUTIVE NOMINATIONS
- In the Senate
- Third consideration and final passage
- Re-reported as committed
On December 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Second consideration
- Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
On November 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Removed from table
On November 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Laid on the table
- First consideration
- Reported as amended
On October 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to CHILDREN AND YOUTH
On October 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- In the House
- Third consideration and final passage
On October 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Re-reported as amended
On October 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration
On October 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- First consideration
- Reported as amended
On September 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to AGING AND YOUTH
+ − Votes (5)
December 11, 2013: Senate Floor Vote: SB 1116 PN 1588, CONCUR IN HOUSE AMENDMENTS
December 10, 2013: House Floor Vote: SB 1116 PN 1588, FP
October 16, 2013: Senate Floor Vote: SB 1116 PN 1475, FINAL PASSAGE
October 15, 2013: Senate Appropriations Vote: Senate Bill 1116 - Re-Reported as Amended
October 1, 2013: Senate Aging And Youth Vote: Senate Bill 1116 - Reported as Amended
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor