+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (27)
On June 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- Act No. 82
- Approved by the Governor
On June 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Presented to the Governor
- Signed in House
On June 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed in Senate
- Senate concurred in House amendments
On June 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Re-reported on concurrence, as committed
On June 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to RULES AND EXECUTIVE NOMINATIONS
On June 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- In the Senate
- Third consideration and final passage
- Re-reported as committed
On June 9, 2014 in the Senate:
- Second consideration, with amendments
- Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
- Remarks see House Journal Page 685
On June 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Removed from table
On April 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- Laid on the table
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On November 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS
On November 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- In the House
- Third consideration and final passage
On November 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Second consideration
On November 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Re-reported as committed
On October 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
On October 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On October 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS
+ − Votes (5)
June 10, 2014: House Floor Vote: SB 1115 PN 2114, FP
June 9, 2014: House Floor Vote: SB 1115 PN 1458, 2013 A7299, SWANGER
November 18, 2013: Senate Floor Vote: SB 1115 PN 1458, FINAL PASSAGE
+ − Sponsors (14)
Type:
Primary Sponsor