+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (37)
On November 3, 2020 in the Senate:
- Act No. 112
- Approved by the Governor
On October 26, 2020 in the Senate:
- Presented to the Governor
- Signed in House
On October 21, 2020 in the Senate:
- Re-reported as committed
- Third consideration and final passage (201-0)
- Remarks see House Journal Page ....
- In the Senate
- Referred to RULES AND EXECUTIVE NOMINATIONS
- Re-reported on concurrence, as committed
- Senate concurred in House amendments (45-2)
- Vote on concurrence reconsidered
- Senate concurred in House amendments (47-0)
- Remarks see Senate Journal Page ....
- Signed in Senate
On October 20, 2020 in the Senate:
- Remarks see House Journal Page ....
- Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration, with amendments
On August 31, 2020 in the Senate:
- Removed from table
- Laid on the table
On May 26, 2020 in the Senate:
- Removed from table
On May 18, 2020 in the Senate:
- Laid on the table
- First consideration
- Reported as amended
On April 29, 2020 in the Senate:
- Third consideration and final passage (47-3)
- Amended on third consideration
- Remarks see Senate Journal Page 312-313, 316-318
- In the House
- Referred to HEALTH
On April 28, 2020 in the Senate:
- Remarks see Senate Journal Page 297-299
- Amended on third consideration
- Re-reported as committed
On April 21, 2020 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration
On April 20, 2020 in the Senate:
- First consideration
- Reported as amended
On April 13, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
+ − Analysis
+ − Amendments (5)
+ − Votes (7)
October 21, 2020: House Floor Vote: SB 1110 PN 2107, FP
October 21, 2020: Senate Floor Vote: SB 1110 PN 2107, CONCUR IN HOUSE AMENDMENTS
October 20, 2020: House Floor Vote: SB 1110 PN 1702, 2019 A7717, FRANKEL
April 29, 2020: Senate Floor Vote: SB 1110 PN 1661, FINAL PASSAGE
+ − Sponsors (14)
Type:
Primary Sponsor