+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (26)
On June 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- Act No. 81
- Approved by the Governor
On June 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Presented to the Governor
- Signed in House
On June 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed in Senate
- Senate concurred in House amendments
On June 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Re-reported on concurrence, as committed
- Referred to RULES AND EXECUTIVE NOMINATIONS
On June 16, 2014 in the Senate:
- In the Senate
- Third consideration and final passage
- Re-reported as committed
On June 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration
On June 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Removed from table
On June 9, 2014 in the Senate:
- Laid on the table
- First consideration
- Reported as amended
On October 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to GAME AND FISHERIES
On October 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- In the House
- Third consideration and final passage
On October 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Re-reported as committed
On October 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration
On October 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- First consideration
- Reported as amended
On September 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to GAME AND FISHERIES
+ − Votes (5)
June 16, 2014: House Floor Vote: SB 1102 PN 2109, FP
October 21, 2013: Senate Floor Vote: SB 1102 PN 1424, FINAL PASSAGE
October 15, 2013: Senate Appropriations Vote: Senate Bill 1102 - Re-Reported as Committed
+ − Sponsors (32)
Type:
Primary Sponsor