+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (29)
On October 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- Act No. 80
- Approved by the Governor
On October 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- Presented to the Governor
- Signed in House
On October 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed in Senate
- Remarks see Senate Journal Page ....
- Senate concurred in House amendments (49-0)
- Re-reported on concurrence, as committed
On October 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to RULES AND EXECUTIVE NOMINATIONS
On October 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- In the Senate
- Third consideration and final passage (191-0)
- Re-reported as committed
On October 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration
On June 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Removed from table
On June 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Laid on the table
- First consideration
- Reported as amended
On April 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to JUDICIARY
On April 18, 2018 in the Senate:
- In the House
- Remarks see Senate Journal Page 328
- Third consideration and final passage (49-0)
On April 17, 2018 in the Senate:
- Amended on third consideration
On April 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- Re-reported as committed
- Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration
On March 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On March 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to JUDICIARY
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (3)
October 15, 2018: Senate Floor Vote: SB 1090 PN 1825, CONCUR IN HOUSE AMENDMENTS
October 9, 2018: House Floor Vote: SB 1090 PN 1825, FP
April 18, 2018: Senate Floor Vote: SB 1090 PN 1661, FINAL PASSAGE
+ − Sponsors (24)
Type:
Primary Sponsor