+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (11)
On October 8, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to JUDICIARY
On October 6, 2020 in the Senate:
- In the House
- Remarks see Senate Journal Page ....
- Third consideration and final passage (50-0)
On October 5, 2020 in the Senate:
- Amended on third consideration
On September 22, 2020 in the Senate:
- Re-reported as committed
- Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration
On September 21, 2020 in the Senate:
- First consideration
- Reported as amended
On April 13, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to JUDICIARY
+ − Analysis
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Vote
October 6, 2020: Senate Floor Vote: SB 1075 PN 2067, FINAL PASSAGE
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor