+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (13)
On May 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- In the House
- Remarks see Senate Journal Page 461
On April 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to JUDICIARY
On April 25, 2018 in the Senate:
- Third consideration and final passage (49-0)
On April 24, 2018 in the Senate:
- Remarks see Senate Journal Page 357
- Amended on third consideration
On April 17, 2018 in the Senate:
- Remarks see Senate Journal Page 298-304
On April 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- Re-reported as committed
On March 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration
On March 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- First consideration
- Reported as amended
On March 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to JUDICIARY