+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (10)
On May 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to JUDICIARY
On May 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- In the House
- Third consideration and final passage (50-0)
On May 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Amended on third consideration
On April 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- Re-reported as committed
On March 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration
On March 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- First consideration
- Reported as amended
On October 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to JUDICIARY
+ − Vote
May 16, 2016: Senate Floor Vote: SB 1031 PN 1764, FINAL PASSAGE
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor