+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (11)
On June 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- In the House
- Remarks see Senate Journal Page 520
On March 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS
On March 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Remarks see Senate Journal Page 177
- Third consideration and final passage (49-0)
On December 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Removed from table
- Laid on the table
On December 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Second consideration
On November 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- First consideration
- Reported as amended
On October 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS
+ − Vote
March 15, 2016: Senate Floor Vote: SB 1013 PN 1427, FINAL PASSAGE
+ − Sponsors (14)
Type:
Primary Sponsor