+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On June 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Laid on the table
On June 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Removed from table
- Laid on the table
On April 13, 2016 in the Senate:
- Second consideration
On April 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On September 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to ENVIRONMENTAL RESOURCES AND ENERGY
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor