+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (26)
On July 9, 2014 in the Senate:
- Act No. 119
- Approved by the Governor
On July 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- Presented to the Governor
- Signed in House
- Signed in Senate
- Senate concurred in House amendments
- Re-reported on concurrence, as committed
- Referred to RULES AND EXECUTIVE NOMINATIONS
- In the Senate
- Third consideration and final passage
- Re-reported as committed
On June 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration
On June 29, 2014 in the Senate:
- Removed from table
On June 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Laid on the table
- First consideration
- Reported as amended
On June 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to JUDICIARY
On June 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- In the House
- Third consideration and final passage
On June 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Amended on third consideration
On June 2, 2014 in the Senate:
- Amended on third consideration
On May 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Second consideration
On May 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- First consideration
- Reported as amended
On June 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT
+ − Votes (3)
July 1, 2014: House Floor Vote: SB 1001 PN 2154, FP
June 4, 2014: Senate Floor Vote: SB 1001 PN 2086, FINAL PASSAGE
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor