+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (29)
On December 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Laid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9)
On October 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- Motion to reconsider the vote by which Senate failed to re-pass the bill, which had been disapproved by the Governor
- Motion to override the Governor's Veto defeated, and the Governor's Veto sustained Oct. 28, 2015 (30-19)
- Remarks see Senate Journal Page 1153
On October 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Bill, together with Governor's Veto Message, removed from table
On September 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- Bill, together with Governor's Veto Message, laid on the table
- In the Senate
- Veto No. 7
- Vetoed by the Governor
On September 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- Presented to the Governor
- Signed in Senate
On September 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Third consideration and final passage (117-83)
- Re-reported as committed
- Remarks see House Journal Page 1601
- Signed in House
On September 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration
On September 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Removed from table
- Laid on the table
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
- Referred to APPROPRIATIONS
On September 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- In the House
- Remarks see Senate Journal Page 970
- Third consideration and final passage (30-19)
On September 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Second consideration
On September 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On September 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to APPROPRIATIONS
+ − Votes (3)
September 24, 2015: House Floor Vote: SB 1000 PN 1232, FP
September 18, 2015: Senate Floor Vote: SB 1000 PN 1232, FINAL PASSAGE
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor