+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (16)
On October 11, 2018 in the Senate:
- Removed from table
On October 10, 2018 in the Senate:
- Laid on the table
- First consideration
- Reported as amended
On February 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to JUDICIARY
On February 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- In the House
- Remarks see Senate Journal Page 123
- Third consideration and final passage (37-12)
On February 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Re-reported as amended
- Re-referred to RULES AND EXECUTIVE NOMINATIONS
- Second consideration
- Re-reported as committed
On January 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
On January 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- First consideration
- Reported as amended
On January 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (6)
February 7, 2017: Senate Floor Vote: SB 10 PN 295, A162, HUGHES AMENDMENT NO. A-00162
February 7, 2017: Senate Floor Vote: SB 10 PN 295, A165, BLAKE AMENDMENT NO. A-0165
February 7, 2017: Senate Floor Vote: SB 10 PN 295, A170, SABATINA AMENDMENT NO. A-0170
February 7, 2017: Senate Floor Vote: SB 10 PN 295, A163, HUGHES AMENDMENT NO. A-0163
February 7, 2017: Senate Floor Vote: SB 10 PN 295, A161, HUGHES AMENDMENT NO. A-0161
February 7, 2017: Senate Floor Vote: SB 10 PN 295, FINAL PASSAGE
+ − Sponsors (22)
Type:
Primary Sponsor