+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On November 19, 2020 in the House:
- Removed from table
- Laid on the table
On September 16, 2020 in the House:
- Removed from table
- Laid on the table
On June 15, 2020 in the House:
- Removed from table
- Laid on the table
On April 29, 2020 in the House:
- Removed from table
- Laid on the table
On February 4, 2020 in the House:
- Reported as committed
On February 3, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT
+ − Analysis
+ − Sponsors (32)
Type:
Primary Sponsor