+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On November 10, 2020 in the House:
- Removed from table
- Laid on the table
On August 31, 2020 in the House:
- Removed from table
- Laid on the table
On May 26, 2020 in the House:
- Removed from table
- Laid on the table
On April 16, 2020 in the House:
- Removed from table
- Laid on the table
On January 14, 2020 in the House:
- Removed from table
- Laid on the table
On October 23, 2019 in the House:
- Reported as committed
On February 6, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT
+ − Analysis
+ − Sponsors (30)
Type:
Primary Sponsor