+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (18)
On September 27, 2016 in the House:
- Removed from table
- Laid on the table
On June 23, 2016 in the House:
- Removed from table
- Laid on the table
On May 17, 2016 in the House:
- Removed from table
- Laid on the table
On March 17, 2016 in the House:
- Removed from table
- Laid on the table
On December 22, 2015 in the House:
- Laid on the table
- Removed from table
On December 5, 2015 in the House:
- Removed from table
- Laid on the table
On November 9, 2015 in the House:
- Removed from table
- Laid on the table
On September 24, 2015 in the House:
- Removed from table
- Laid on the table
On June 23, 2015 in the House:
- Reported as committed
On June 11, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to JUDICIARY
+ − Sponsors (22)
Type:
Primary Sponsor