+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On November 10, 2020 in the House:
- Removed from table
- Laid on the table
On August 31, 2020 in the House:
- Removed from table
- Laid on the table
On May 27, 2020 in the House:
- Remarks see House Journal Page 798-799
On May 26, 2020 in the House:
- Removed from table
- Laid on the table
On April 16, 2020 in the House:
- Removed from table
- Laid on the table
On January 14, 2020 in the House:
- Removed from table
- Laid on the table
On October 23, 2019 in the House:
- Reported as committed
On March 13, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT
+ − Analysis
+ − Sponsors (31)
Type:
Primary Sponsor