+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (15)
On July 13, 2015 in the House:
- Laid on the table
On June 30, 2015 in the House:
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On June 18, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to TRANSPORTATION
On June 16, 2015 in the House:
- In the Senate
- Remarks see House Journal Page 1032-1033
- Third consideration and final passage (192-0)
On June 15, 2015 in the House:
- Re-reported as committed
On June 10, 2015 in the House:
- Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration
On June 9, 2015 in the House:
- Removed from table
On June 1, 2015 in the House:
- Laid on the table
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On April 20, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to TRANSPORTATION
+ − Vote
June 16, 2015: House Floor Vote: HB 987 PN 1272, FP
+ − Sponsors (54)
Type:
Primary Sponsor