+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On October 2, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS
On September 30, 2020 in the House:
- In the Senate
- Third consideration and final passage (202-0)
- Re-reported as committed
On September 29, 2020 in the House:
- Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration
On September 17, 2020 in the House:
- Removed from table
On September 16, 2020 in the House:
- Laid on the table
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On March 26, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS
+ − Analysis
+ − Vote
September 30, 2020: House Floor Vote: HB 980 PN 1110, FP
+ − Sponsors (47)
Type:
Primary Sponsor