+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On October 17, 2016 in the House:
- Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
On September 27, 2016 in the House:
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On April 1, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to FINANCE
On March 22, 2016 in the House:
- In the Senate
- Third consideration and final passage (192-0)
- Re-reported as committed
On May 4, 2015 in the House:
- Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration
On April 22, 2015 in the House:
- Removed from table
On April 21, 2015 in the House:
- Laid on the table
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On April 15, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to FINANCE
+ − Vote
March 22, 2016: House Floor Vote: HB 971 PN 1227, FP
+ − Sponsors (45)
Type:
Primary Sponsor