+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (31)
On July 20, 2016 in the House:
- Act No. 92
- Approved by the Governor
On July 11, 2016 in the House:
- Presented to the Governor
- Signed in Senate
On July 10, 2016 in the House:
- Signed in House
- Remarks see House Journal Page
- House concurred in Senate amendments (184-0)
- Re-reported on concurrence, as committed
On July 1, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to RULES
- In the House
- Remarks see Senate Journal Page 722-723
- Third consideration and final passage (49-0)
- Re-reported as amended
On June 29, 2016 in the House:
- Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration
On June 23, 2016 in the House:
- First consideration
- Reported as amended
On April 12, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to AGRICULTURE AND RURAL AFFAIRS
On April 6, 2016 in the House:
- In the Senate
- Third consideration and final passage (187-0)
- Re-reported as committed
On April 5, 2016 in the House:
- Remarks see House Journal Page 481-482
- Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration, with amendments
On March 23, 2016 in the House:
- Removed from table
On November 18, 2015 in the House:
- Laid on the table
- Removed from table
On October 6, 2015 in the House:
- Laid on the table
- First consideration
- Reported as amended
On April 15, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to AGRICULTURE AND RURAL AFFAIRS
+ − Votes (5)
July 10, 2016: House Floor Vote: HB 967 PN 3706, CONCUR
July 1, 2016: Senate Floor Vote: HB 967 PN 3706, FINAL PASSAGE
April 6, 2016: House Floor Vote: HB 967 PN 3087, FP
April 5, 2016: House Floor Vote: HB 967 PN 2312, 2015 A6395, DIAMOND
April 5, 2016: House Floor Vote: HB 967 PN 2312, 2015 A6279, FLYNN
+ − Sponsors (33)
Type:
Primary Sponsor