+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (32)
On November 26, 2019 in the House:
- Act No. 87
- Approved by the Governor
On November 22, 2019 in the House:
- Presented to the Governor
On November 21, 2019 in the House:
- Signed in Senate
- Signed in House
- Remarks see House Journal Page 1934-1937
- House concurred in Senate amendments (182-5)
- Re-reported on concurrence, as committed
- Referred to RULES
On November 20, 2019 in the House:
- In the House
- Remarks see Senate Journal Page
- Third consideration and final passage (48-0)
- Amended on third consideration
On November 19, 2019 in the House:
- Re-reported as committed
- Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration
On November 18, 2019 in the House:
- First consideration
- Reported as amended
On April 22, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to JUDICIARY
On April 10, 2019 in the House:
- In the Senate
- Remarks see House Journal Page 509-513
- Third consideration and final passage (187-5)
- Re-reported as committed
On April 9, 2019 in the House:
- Remarks see House Journal Page 473-474
- Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration, with amendments
On April 8, 2019 in the House:
- Removed from table
- Laid on the table
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On April 3, 2019 in the House:
- Corrective Reprint, Printer's No. 1187
On March 27, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to JUDICIARY
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (8)
November 21, 2019: House Floor Vote: HB 962 PN 2938, CONCUR
November 20, 2019: Senate Floor Vote: HB 962 PN 2938, FINAL PASSAGE
November 20, 2019: Senate Floor Vote: HB 962 PN 2891, A3961, MUTH AMENDMENT NO. A-3961
November 20, 2019: Senate Floor Vote: HB 962 PN 2891, A3953, KEARNEY AMENDMENT NO. A-3953
November 20, 2019: Senate Floor Vote: HB 962 PN 2891, A4106, BAKER AMENDMENT NO. A-4106
November 20, 2019: Senate Floor Vote: HB 962 PN 2891, A3954, MUTH AMENDMENT NO. A-3954
April 10, 2019: House Floor Vote: HB 962 PN 1352, FP
April 9, 2019: House Floor Vote: HB 962 PN 1187, 2019 A662, GREGORY
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor