+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (11)
On June 18, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to JUDICIARY
On June 15, 2015 in the House:
- In the Senate
- Third consideration and final passage (189-0)
- Re-reported as committed
On June 10, 2015 in the House:
- Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration
- Re-reported as committed
On June 2, 2015 in the House:
- Re-committed to RULES
- First consideration
- Reported as amended
On April 10, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to JUDICIARY
+ − Vote
June 15, 2015: House Floor Vote: HB 954 PN 1689, FP
+ − Sponsors (29)
Type:
Primary Sponsor