+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (17)
On February 8, 2016 in the House:
- Laid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9)
On December 7, 2015 in the House:
- First consideration
- Reported as amended
On October 22, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to TRANSPORTATION
On October 20, 2015 in the House:
- In the Senate
- Remarks see House Journal Page 1800-1805
- Third consideration and final passage (179-18)
- Re-reported as committed
On October 19, 2015 in the House:
- Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration
On October 7, 2015 in the House:
- Removed from table
On September 21, 2015 in the House:
- Laid on the table
- Re-reported as committed
On June 22, 2015 in the House:
- Re-committed to RULES
- First consideration
- Reported as amended
On April 10, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to TRANSPORTATION
+ − Vote
October 20, 2015: House Floor Vote: HB 950 PN 1850, FP
+ − Sponsors (53)
Type:
Primary Sponsor