+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (15)
On July 28, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to CONSUMER PROTECTION AND PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE
On July 1, 2016 in the House:
- In the Senate
- Remarks see House Journal Page
- Third consideration and final passage (198-0)
- Re-reported as committed
On June 30, 2016 in the House:
- Remarks see House Journal Page
- Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration, with amendments
On June 23, 2016 in the House:
- Removed from table
On November 23, 2015 in the House:
- Laid on the table
- Removed from table
On October 19, 2015 in the House:
- Laid on the table
- First consideration
- Reported as amended
On August 18, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to HEALTH
+ − Votes (2)
July 1, 2016: House Floor Vote: HB 947 PN 3694, FP
June 30, 2016: House Floor Vote: HB 947 PN 2372, 2015 A9300, FABRIZIO
+ − Sponsors (49)
Type:
Primary Sponsor