+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On November 22, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
On November 20, 2019 in the House:
- In the Senate
- Third consideration and final passage (197-0)
- Re-reported as committed
On November 19, 2019 in the House:
- Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration
On October 30, 2019 in the House:
- Removed from table
On September 17, 2019 in the House:
- Laid on the table
- Re-reported as committed
On June 11, 2019 in the House:
- Re-committed to RULES
- First consideration
- Reported as amended
On April 29, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to HEALTH
+ − Analysis
+ − Amendment
+ − Vote
November 20, 2019: House Floor Vote: HB 944 PN 2090, FP
+ − Sponsors (56)
Type:
Primary Sponsor