+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (31)
On July 23, 2020 in the House:
- Act No. 67
- Approved by the Governor
On July 13, 2020 in the House:
- Presented to the Governor
- Signed in Senate
On July 7, 2020 in the House:
- Signed in House
- Remarks see House Journal Page 1036-1037
- House concurred in Senate amendments (201-0)
- Re-reported on concurrence, as committed
- Referred to RULES
On June 30, 2020 in the House:
- In the House
- Third consideration and final passage (50-0)
On June 29, 2020 in the House:
- Amended on third consideration
On June 24, 2020 in the House:
- Re-reported as committed
On April 29, 2020 in the House:
- Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration
On April 28, 2020 in the House:
- First consideration
- Reported as amended
On November 22, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
On November 20, 2019 in the House:
- In the Senate
- Remarks see House Journal Page 1911-1912
- Third consideration and final passage (197-0)
- Re-reported as committed
On November 19, 2019 in the House:
- Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration
On October 30, 2019 in the House:
- Removed from table
On September 17, 2019 in the House:
- Laid on the table
- Re-reported as committed
On June 11, 2019 in the House:
- Re-committed to RULES
- First consideration
- Reported as amended
On April 29, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to HEALTH
+ − Analysis
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (3)
July 7, 2020: House Floor Vote: HB 943 PN 4053, CONCUR
June 30, 2020: Senate Floor Vote: HB 943 PN 4053, FINAL PASSAGE
November 20, 2019: House Floor Vote: HB 943 PN 2089, FP
+ − Sponsors (56)
Type:
Primary Sponsor