+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (26)
On November 25, 2020 in the House:
- Act No. 121
- Approved by the Governor
On November 20, 2020 in the House:
- Presented to the Governor
On November 19, 2020 in the House:
- Signed in Senate
- Signed in House
- Third consideration and final passage (49-0)
On October 20, 2020 in the House:
- Removed from table
- Laid on the table
On July 14, 2020 in the House:
- Re-reported as committed
On June 30, 2020 in the House:
- Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration
On June 29, 2020 in the House:
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On November 22, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
On November 20, 2019 in the House:
- In the Senate
- Third consideration and final passage (197-0)
- Re-reported as committed
On November 19, 2019 in the House:
- Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration
On October 30, 2019 in the House:
- Removed from table
On September 17, 2019 in the House:
- Laid on the table
- Re-reported as committed
On June 11, 2019 in the House:
- Re-committed to RULES
- First consideration
- Reported as amended
On May 15, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to HEALTH
+ − Analysis
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (2)
November 19, 2020: Senate Floor Vote: HB 942 PN 2088, FINAL PASSAGE
November 20, 2019: House Floor Vote: HB 942 PN 2088, FP
+ − Sponsors (35)
Type:
Primary Sponsor