+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (38)
On November 25, 2020 in the House:
- Act No. 120
- Approved by the Governor
On November 20, 2020 in the House:
- Presented to the Governor
- Signed in Senate
- Signed in House
- Senate concurred in House amendments to Senate amendments (49-0)
- Re-reported on concurrence, as committed
On November 18, 2020 in the House:
- Re-reported on concurrence, as amended
- House concurred in Senate amendments, as amended by the House (201-0)
- Remarks see House Journal Page
- In the Senate
- Referred to RULES AND EXECUTIVE NOMINATIONS
On October 26, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to RULES
On October 21, 2020 in the House:
- In the House
- Third consideration and final passage (47-2)
- Re-reported as committed
On October 20, 2020 in the House:
- Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
- Amended on third consideration (45-3)
On October 5, 2020 in the House:
- Laid on the table
- Removed from table
On June 30, 2020 in the House:
- Second consideration
On June 29, 2020 in the House:
- First consideration
- Reported as amended
On November 22, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
On November 20, 2019 in the House:
- In the Senate
- Remarks see House Journal Page 1909-1910
- Third consideration and final passage (197-0)
- Re-reported as committed
On November 19, 2019 in the House:
- Second consideration, with amendments
- Remarks see House Journal Page 1845-1846
- Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
On October 30, 2019 in the House:
- Removed from table
On September 17, 2019 in the House:
- Laid on the table
- Re-reported as committed
On June 11, 2019 in the House:
- Re-committed to RULES
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On May 7, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to HEALTH
+ − Analysis
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Votes (6)
November 20, 2020: Senate Floor Vote: HB 941 PN 4617, CONCUR IN HOUSE AMENDMENTS TO SENATE AMENDMENTS
November 18, 2020: House Floor Vote: HB 941 PN 4617, CONCUR
October 21, 2020: Senate Floor Vote: HB 941 PN 4574, FINAL PASSAGE
October 20, 2020: Senate Floor Vote: HB 941 PN 4049, A7756, AUMENT AMENDMENT NO. A-7756
November 20, 2019: House Floor Vote: HB 941 PN 2922, FP
November 19, 2019: House Floor Vote: HB 941 PN 1748, 2019 A3878, HEFFLEY
+ − Sponsors (62)
Type:
Primary Sponsor