+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (27)
On July 11, 2022 in the House:
- Act No. 60 of 2022
- Approved by the Governor
On July 8, 2022 in the House:
- Presented to the Governor
On July 7, 2022 in the House:
- Signed in Senate
- Signed in House
- Remarks see House Journal Page
- House concurred in Senate amendments (147-53)
- Re-reported on concurrence, as committed
- Referred to RULES
On July 6, 2022 in the Senate:
- Third consideration and final passage (32-18)
On June 29, 2022 in the Senate:
- Re-reported as committed
On June 28, 2022 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration
On June 21, 2022 in the Senate:
- First consideration
- Reported as amended
On June 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to JUDICIARY
On June 9, 2021 in the House:
- Remarks see House Journal Page 836-837
- Third consideration and final passage (145-56)
- Re-reported as committed
On June 8, 2021 in the House:
- Remarks see House Journal Page 795-797
- Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration, with amendments
On May 26, 2021 in the House:
- Removed from table
On May 4, 2021 in the House:
- Laid on the table
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On March 17, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to JUDICIARY
+ − Analysis
+ − Votes (5)
July 7, 2022: House Floor Vote: HB 940 PN 3285, CONCUR
July 6, 2022: Senate Floor Vote: HB 940 PN 3285, Final Passage
June 9, 2021: House Floor Vote: HB 940 PN 1725, FP
June 8, 2021: House Floor Vote: HB 940 PN 948, 2021 A1370, FARRY
June 8, 2021: House Floor Vote: HB 940 PN 948, 2021 A1468, STEPHENS
+ − Sponsors (34)
Type:
Primary Sponsor