+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On May 24, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to TRANSPORTATION
On May 13, 2019 in the House:
- In the Senate
- Third consideration and final passage (199-0)
- Re-reported as committed
On May 8, 2019 in the House:
- Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration
On May 6, 2019 in the House:
- Removed from table
On April 30, 2019 in the House:
- Laid on the table
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On March 25, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to TRANSPORTATION
+ − Vote
May 13, 2019: House Floor Vote: HB 937 PN 1068, FP
+ − Sponsors (29)
Type:
Primary Sponsor