+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (33)
On October 18, 2016 in the House:
- Removed from table
- Laid on the table
On June 30, 2016 in the House:
- Removed from table
- Laid on the table
On May 25, 2016 in the House:
- Removed from table
- Laid on the table
On March 23, 2016 in the House:
- Removed from table
- Laid on the table
On January 11, 2016 in the House:
- Removed from table
- Laid on the table
On December 9, 2015 in the House:
- Re-reported on concurrence, as amended
On November 18, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to RULES
On November 17, 2015 in the House:
- In the House
- Third consideration and final passage (49-0)
On November 16, 2015 in the House:
- Re-reported as committed
On June 28, 2015 in the House:
- Second consideration
- Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
On June 26, 2015 in the House:
- Reported as amended
- First consideration
On May 8, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to PUBLIC HEALTH AND WELFARE
On May 5, 2015 in the House:
- In the Senate
- Remarks see House Journal Page 672-673
- Third consideration and final passage (198-0)
- Re-reported as committed
On April 21, 2015 in the House:
- Second consideration, with amendments
- Remarks see House Journal Page 552-553
- Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
On April 20, 2015 in the House:
- Removed from table
On April 15, 2015 in the House:
- Laid on the table
- First consideration
- Reported as amended
On April 9, 2015 in the House:
- Corrective Reprint, Printer's No. 1138
On April 8, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to HEALTH
+ − Votes (4)
November 17, 2015: Senate Floor Vote: HB 934 PN 1946, FINAL PASSAGE
May 5, 2015: House Floor Vote: HB 934 PN 1330, FP
April 21, 2015: House Floor Vote: HB 934 PN 1237, 2015 A767, CHRISTIANA
April 21, 2015: House Floor Vote: HB 934 PN 1237, 2015 A693, KAUFER
+ − Sponsors (28)
Type:
Primary Sponsor