+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (21)
On October 24, 2016 in the House:
- Amended on third consideration
On October 17, 2016 in the House:
- Removed from table
On May 16, 2016 in the House:
- Laid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9)
On April 5, 2016 in the House:
- Second consideration
On March 23, 2016 in the House:
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On October 23, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to APPROPRIATIONS
On October 21, 2015 in the House:
- Third consideration and final passage (121-76)
- Re-reported as committed
- Remarks see House Journal Page 1823
- In the Senate
On October 20, 2015 in the House:
- Remarks see House Journal Page 1795
- Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration, with amendments
On October 19, 2015 in the House:
- Removed from table
On September 21, 2015 in the House:
- Laid on the table
- Re-reported as committed
On June 23, 2015 in the House:
- Re-committed to RULES
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On May 11, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to FINANCE
+ − Votes (2)
October 21, 2015: House Floor Vote: HB 928 PN 2409, FP
October 20, 2015: House Floor Vote: HB 928 PN 1488, 2015 A2503, YOUNGBLOOD
+ − Sponsors (29)
Type:
Primary Sponsor