+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (26)
On November 20, 2020 in the House:
- Remarks see House Journal Page
- Re-committed to RULES
- Vote on non-concurrence reconsidered (106-96)
- House non-concurred in Senate amendments (51-151)
- Re-reported on concurrence, as committed
On November 19, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to RULES
- In the House
- Remarks see Senate Journal Page
- Third consideration and final passage (46-3)
On November 18, 2020 in the House:
- Amended on third consideration
- Re-reported as committed
- Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration
On November 17, 2020 in the House:
- First consideration
- Reported as amended
On January 24, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to TRANSPORTATION
On January 13, 2020 in the House:
- In the Senate
- Third consideration and final passage (142-51)
- Re-reported as committed
On December 18, 2019 in the House:
- Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration
On December 17, 2019 in the House:
- Removed from table
On September 25, 2019 in the House:
- Laid on the table
- First consideration
- Reported as amended
On March 20, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to TRANSPORTATION
+ − Analysis
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (6)
November 20, 2020: House Floor Vote: HB 916 PN 4618, MOT RECOM TRANS, KORTZ
November 20, 2020: House Floor Vote: HB 916 PN 4618, CONCUR
November 20, 2020: House Floor Vote: HB 916 PN 4618, MOT RECON, BENNINGHOFF
November 20, 2020: House Floor Vote: HB 916 PN 4618, MOT RECOM, BENNINGHOFF
November 19, 2020: Senate Floor Vote: HB 916 PN 4618, FINAL PASSAGE
January 13, 2020: House Floor Vote: HB 916 PN 2582, FP
+ − Sponsors (14)
Type:
Primary Sponsor