+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (20)
On October 30, 2015 in the House:
- Approved by the Governor
- Act No. 53
On October 21, 2015 in the House:
- Presented to the Governor
On October 20, 2015 in the House:
- Signed in Senate
On October 19, 2015 in the House:
- Signed in House
On October 14, 2015 in the House:
- Third consideration and final passage (49-0)
On October 13, 2015 in the House:
- Second consideration
On September 30, 2015 in the House:
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On June 19, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT
On June 17, 2015 in the House:
- Re-reported as committed
- In the Senate
- Third consideration and final passage (187-2)
On June 16, 2015 in the House:
- Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration
- Re-reported as committed
On June 3, 2015 in the House:
- Re-committed to RULES
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On April 6, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT