+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (30)
On November 17, 2015 in the House:
- Pamphlet Laws Resolution No. 1
- Filed in the Office of the Secretary of the Commonwealth
- Signed in Senate
- Signed in House
On November 16, 2015 in the House:
- Remarks see Senate Journal Page 1190
- Third consideration and final passage (36-13)
On October 28, 2015 in the House:
- Second consideration
On October 27, 2015 in the House:
- Re-reported as committed
On June 30, 2015 in the House:
- Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
On June 24, 2015 in the House:
- Removed from table
- Laid on the table
On June 1, 2015 in the House:
- Removed from table
- Laid on the table
On April 15, 2015 in the House:
- Removed from table
- Laid on the table
On February 17, 2015 in the House:
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On February 13, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to JUDICIARY
On February 10, 2015 in the House:
- In the Senate
- Remarks see House Journal Page 157
- Third consideration and final passage (154-44)
- Re-reported as committed
On February 9, 2015 in the House:
- Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration
On February 4, 2015 in the House:
- Removed from table
On February 3, 2015 in the House:
- Laid on the table
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On January 28, 2015 in the House:
- Corrective Reprint, Printer's No. 251
On January 21, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to JUDICIARY
+ − Votes (2)
November 16, 2015: Senate Floor Vote: HB 90 PN 251, FINAL PASSAGE
February 10, 2015: House Floor Vote: HB 90 PN 251, FP
+ − Sponsors (21)
Type:
Primary Sponsor