+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (27)
On December 23, 2013 in the House:
- Act No. 126
- Approved by the Governor
On December 18, 2013 in the House:
- Presented to the Governor
On December 17, 2013 in the House:
- Signed in Senate
On December 16, 2013 in the House:
- Signed in House
- Remarks see House Journal Page 2246
- House concurred in Senate amendments
- Re-reported on concurrence, as committed
On December 12, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to RULES
On December 11, 2013 in the House:
- In the House
- Third consideration and final passage
On December 10, 2013 in the House:
- Amended on third consideration
On December 9, 2013 in the House:
- Second consideration
On December 4, 2013 in the House:
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On June 7, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to TRANSPORTATION
On June 4, 2013 in the House:
- In the Senate
- Third consideration and final passage
- Re-reported as committed
On June 3, 2013 in the House:
- Remarks see House Journal Page 919
- Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration
On May 15, 2013 in the House:
- Removed from table
On May 13, 2013 in the House:
- Laid on the table
- First consideration
- Reported as amended
On March 11, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to TRANSPORTATION
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (7)
December 16, 2013: House Floor Vote: HB 892 PN 2779, CONCUR
December 11, 2013: Senate Floor Vote: HB 892 PN 2779, FINAL PASSAGE
June 4, 2013: House Floor Vote: HB 892 PN 1788, FP
June 3, 2013: House Floor Vote: HB 892 PN 1788, 2013 A1566, METZGAR
+ − Sponsors (104)
Type:
Primary Sponsor