+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (29)
On November 4, 2015 in the House:
- Act No. 59
- Approved by the Governor
On October 28, 2015 in the House:
- Presented to the Governor
- Signed in Senate
On October 27, 2015 in the House:
- Signed in House
- Remarks see House Journal Page 1857-1861
- House concurred in Senate amendments (107-91)
- Re-reported on concurrence, as committed
On October 21, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to RULES
On October 20, 2015 in the House:
- In the House
- Remarks see Senate Journal Page 1111-1113
- Third consideration and final passage (30-18)
On October 14, 2015 in the House:
- Removed from table
- Laid on the table
On July 13, 2015 in the House:
- Second consideration
On June 30, 2015 in the House:
- First consideration
- Reported as amended
On May 1, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to JUDICIARY
On April 21, 2015 in the House:
- In the Senate
- Remarks see House Journal Page 549-551
- Third consideration and final passage (109-84)
- Re-reported as committed
On April 20, 2015 in the House:
- Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration
On April 15, 2015 in the House:
- Removed from table
On April 14, 2015 in the House:
- Laid on the table
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On April 1, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to JUDICIARY
+ − Votes (6)
October 27, 2015: House Floor Vote: HB 874 PN 2009, 2015 A3780, SUSP RULES, HANNA
October 27, 2015: House Floor Vote: HB 874 PN 2009, 2015 A3781, SUSP RULES, HANNA
October 27, 2015: House Floor Vote: HB 874 PN 2009, CONCUR
October 20, 2015: Senate Floor Vote: HB 874 PN 2009, A3059, FARNESE AMENDMENT NO. A-3059
October 20, 2015: Senate Floor Vote: HB 874 PN 2009, FINAL PASSAGE
April 21, 2015: House Floor Vote: HB 874 PN 1069, FP
+ − Sponsors (76)
Type:
Primary Sponsor