+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (28)
On July 20, 2016 in the House:
- Act No. 91
- Approved by the Governor
On July 11, 2016 in the House:
- Presented to the Governor
- Signed in Senate
On July 10, 2016 in the House:
- Signed in House
- Remarks see House Journal Page
- House concurred in Senate amendments (183-0)
- Re-reported on concurrence, as committed
On July 1, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to RULES
- In the House
- Third consideration and final passage (48-1)
On June 30, 2016 in the House:
- Remarks see Senate Journal Page 705
- Second consideration, with amendments
On June 29, 2016 in the House:
- Removed from table
On June 27, 2016 in the House:
- Laid on the table
On June 7, 2016 in the House:
- First consideration
- Reported as amended
On June 29, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to TRANSPORTATION
On June 25, 2015 in the House:
- In the Senate
- Third consideration and final passage (190-0)
- Re-reported as committed
On June 24, 2015 in the House:
- Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration
- Re-reported as committed
On June 8, 2015 in the House:
- Re-committed to RULES
- First consideration
- Reported as amended
On April 1, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to TRANSPORTATION
+ − Votes (3)
July 10, 2016: House Floor Vote: HB 871 PN 3690, CONCUR
July 1, 2016: Senate Floor Vote: HB 871 PN 3690, FINAL PASSAGE
June 25, 2015: House Floor Vote: HB 871 PN 1727, FP
+ − Sponsors (20)
Type:
Primary Sponsor