+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On November 17, 2020 in the House:
- Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration
On September 21, 2020 in the House:
- First consideration
- Reported as amended
On June 6, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to BANKING AND INSURANCE
On June 5, 2019 in the House:
- In the Senate
- Third consideration and final passage (195-0)
- Re-reported as committed
On June 4, 2019 in the House:
- Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration
On June 3, 2019 in the House:
- Removed from table
On April 16, 2019 in the House:
- Laid on the table
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On March 18, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to COMMERCE
+ − Analysis
+ − Amendment
+ − Vote
June 5, 2019: House Floor Vote: HB 858 PN 972, FP
+ − Sponsors (22)
Type:
Primary Sponsor