+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (15)
On February 25, 2020 in the House:
- Corrective Reprint, Printer's No. 3379
On September 25, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
On September 19, 2019 in the House:
- In the Senate
- Third consideration and final passage (154-32)
- Re-reported as committed
On September 18, 2019 in the House:
- Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
- Remarks see House Journal Page 1479-1481
- Second consideration, with amendments
On September 17, 2019 in the House:
- Removed from table
- Laid on the table
- Re-reported as committed
On June 4, 2019 in the House:
- Re-committed to RULES
- First consideration
- Reported as amended
On March 14, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to HEALTH
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (2)
September 19, 2019: House Floor Vote: HB 847 PN 2512, FP
September 18, 2019: House Floor Vote: HB 847 PN 1984, 2019 A2763, FRANKEL
+ − Sponsors (35)
Type:
Primary Sponsor