+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (30)
On March 25, 2016 in the House:
- Act No. 9
- Approved by the Governor
On March 17, 2016 in the House:
- Presented to the Governor
On March 16, 2016 in the House:
- Signed in Senate
- Signed in House
On March 15, 2016 in the House:
- Senate concurred in House amendments to Senate amendments (49-0)
On March 14, 2016 in the House:
- Re-reported on concurrence, as committed
On December 10, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to RULES AND EXECUTIVE NOMINATIONS
- In the Senate
- Remarks see House Journal Page 2192-2193
- House concurred in Senate amendments, as amended by the House (196-0)
- Re-reported on concurrence, as amended
On November 18, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to RULES
- In the House
- Third consideration and final passage (49-0)
On November 17, 2015 in the House:
- Second consideration
On November 16, 2015 in the House:
- Amended on second consideration
On October 20, 2015 in the House:
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On September 25, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to TRANSPORTATION
On September 21, 2015 in the House:
- In the Senate
- Third consideration and final passage (197-0)
- Re-reported as committed
On July 22, 2015 in the House:
- Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration
On July 21, 2015 in the House:
- Re-reported as committed
On June 17, 2015 in the House:
- Re-committed to RULES
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On March 24, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to TRANSPORTATION
+ − Votes (6)
December 10, 2015: House Floor Vote: HB 838 PN 2536, MOT PROCEED WITH BILL, REED
December 10, 2015: House Floor Vote: HB 838 PN 2536, CONCUR
November 18, 2015: Senate Floor Vote: HB 838 PN 2536, FINAL PASSAGE
November 16, 2015: Senate Floor Vote: HB 838 PN 1006, A3919, GORDNER AMENDMENT NO. A-3919
September 21, 2015: House Floor Vote: HB 838 PN 1006, FP
+ − Sponsors (49)
Type:
Primary Sponsor