+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (22)
On April 12, 2016 in the House:
- Laid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9)
On March 14, 2016 in the House:
- Laid on the table
- Removed from table
On December 10, 2015 in the House:
- Removed from table
- Laid on the table
On November 17, 2015 in the House:
- Removed from table
- Laid on the table
On October 20, 2015 in the House:
- Second consideration
On September 30, 2015 in the House:
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On May 20, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to BANKING AND INSURANCE
On May 13, 2015 in the House:
- Re-reported as committed
- In the Senate
- Third consideration and final passage (191-0)
On May 12, 2015 in the House:
- Remarks see House Journal Page 771
- Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration, with amendments
On May 11, 2015 in the House:
- Removed from table
On April 20, 2015 in the House:
- Laid on the table
- First consideration
- Reported as amended
On March 24, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to COMMERCE
+ − Votes (2)
May 13, 2015: House Floor Vote: HB 837 PN 1556, FP
May 12, 2015: House Floor Vote: HB 837 PN 1316, 2015 A1545, BROWN, R.
+ − Sponsors (17)
Type:
Primary Sponsor