+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On July 13, 2015 in the House:
- Laid on the table
On June 26, 2015 in the House:
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On June 18, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to TRANSPORTATION
On June 15, 2015 in the House:
- In the Senate
- Third consideration and final passage (190-0)
- Re-reported as committed
On June 10, 2015 in the House:
- Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration
On June 9, 2015 in the House:
- Removed from table
On June 1, 2015 in the House:
- Laid on the table
- First consideration
- Reported as amended
On March 24, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to TRANSPORTATION
+ − Vote
June 15, 2015: House Floor Vote: HB 834 PN 1676, FP
+ − Sponsors (50)
Type:
Primary Sponsor